Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Ammannati-Piccolomini

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Administrator of Lucca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1422Born
18 Jul 146038.3AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
18 Dec 146139.7Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 146239.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
17 Aug 147755.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
24 Sep 147755.5AppointedAdministrator of Lucca, Italy
10 Sep 147957.5DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Ammannati-Piccolomini (VIAF: 27087871)
Giacomo Cardinal Ammannati-Piccolomini (born , died ) Bishop of Pavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla Basilica, Pescia, Diocese of Lucca
Death PlaceSan Lorenzo alle Grotte
Buried Place (Original)S. Agostino, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 17.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1461
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 212
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1460, Number 39*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast