Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop NicolÚ Amidano

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jan 1448AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
19 Mar 1453AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
24 Mar 1454DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Amidano:
Archbishop NicolÚ Amidano (died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013