Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi de Amato

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Sep 1497AppointedBishop of Rapolla, Italy
19 Sep 1506AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
26 Jan 1515AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
1530²DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi de Amato
Bishop Luigi de Amato (died 1530) Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 226, and Page 234
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 220
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1497, Number 41*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast