Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Amat

Deceased

Bishop of Bosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jun 1693BornSassari
19 Dec 174653.5AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
1 Oct 174754.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bosa, Italy
1 Aug 174855.2DiedBishop of Bosa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Amat:
Bishop Antonio Amat (died ) Bishop of Bosa

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013