Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simoné Aleotti

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Forli, Italy

Titular Bishop of Lindinen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1513Born
26 Jun 156046.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Forli, Italy
26 Jun 156046.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lindinen
20 Aug 156248.9DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Forli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Simoné Aleotti
Bishop Simoné Aleotti (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Forli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForli, Diocese of Forli
Death PlaceTrento, Diocese of Trento
Buried Place (Original)S. Vigil, Cathedral, Trento, Diocese of Trento

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 226, and Page 198
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 41*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 20 Oct 2017