Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Alvarez Castro

Deceased

Bishop of Coria, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1724Born
29 Mar 179066.1AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
9 May 179066.2Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
29 Aug 180985.5DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Alvarez Castro
Bishop Juan Alvarez Castro (born , died ) Bishop of Coria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMohedas de la Jara

  • a bishop for 19.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,886
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 107, Number 556
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 157
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast