Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bl. Niccolò Cardinal Albergati, O. Cart. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bologna

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1375²BornBologna
Jun 1404³29.4Ordained PriestPriest of Carthusian Order
5 Jan 141742.0SelectedBishop of Bologna, Italy
4 Jul 141742.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bologna, Italy
13 Apr 141843.3ConfirmedBishop of Bologna, Italy
24 May 142651.4Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 142651.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
29 May 142651.4AppointedAdministrator of Bologna, Italy
1440²65.0AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
27 Jul 144065.6AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
9 May 144368.4DiedBishop of Bologna, Italy
25 Sep 1744Beatified

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Niccolò Albergati:
Cardinal Bl. Niccolò Albergati O. Cart. (died ) Bishop of Bologna

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
  • a cardinal for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1426
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 141
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 108
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,820

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 25 Dec 2013