Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Albizzi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1593BornCesena, Italy
2 Mar 165460.4Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 165460.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
24 Aug 167177.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
8 Jan 168086.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
1 Dec 168188.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
5 Oct 168490.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

MicroData Summary for Francesco Albizzi:
Cardinal Francesco Albizzi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

  • a cardinal for 30.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Mar 1654

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013