Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andreas Albinowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Titular Bishop of Ordaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1640³Born
8 Apr 167029.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
13 Apr 167029.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 169554.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
30 May 169554.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ordaea

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andreas Albinowski
Bishop Andreas Albinowski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoscicen

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 297
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast