Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Andrea Cardinal Albani

Deceased

Librarian of the Vatican Library

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1750BornRome, Italy
23 Feb 180150.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
23 Feb 180150.4Elevated to Cardinal
20 May 181766.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
2 Oct 181868.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
12 Mar 182372.4ResignedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
28 Jan 182877.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
31 Mar 182978.5AppointedSecretary of State
23 Apr 183079.6AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
3 Dec 183484.2DiedLibrarian of the Vatican Library

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Andrea Albani:
Giuseppe Andrea Cardinal Albani (born , died ) Librarian of Vatican Library

  • a cardinal for 33.7 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015