Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Alberghini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1770Born
23 Jun 183463.7Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
6 Apr 183564.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
6 Apr 183564.5Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 184777.0DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Alberghini (VIAF: 262833167)
Giuseppe Cardinal Alberghini (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCento, Italy

  • a cardinal for 13.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast