Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giovanni Battista Agnozzi

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate Emeritus to Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1821Born
23 Mar 186846.6AppointedOfficial to Switzerland
23 Jan 187452.4ResignedOfficial to Switzerland
24 Mar 188260.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Colombia
1887¹65.4ResignedApostolic Delegate to Colombia
4 Feb 188866.5DiedApostolic Delegate Emeritus to Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Agnozzi (VIAF: 315956789)
Father Giovanni Battista Agnozzi (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate Emeritus of Colombia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMogliano, Archdiocese of Fermo, Italy
Death PlaceBogota

Source(s):
  • b/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 97, and Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast