Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Agustín y Albanell

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1512Born
6 Aug 154331.4AppointedBishop of Elne, France
8 Feb 154532.9Ordained BishopBishop of Elne, France
8 Jun 154533.2AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
26 Feb 157260.0DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Agustín y Albanell
Bishop Pedro Agustín y Albanell (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurgos
Ordained BishopPerpignan
Death PlaceHuesca, Diocese of Huesca

  • a bishop for 27.0 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,385
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 56, Number 309
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 192, and Page 264
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018