Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Julian Adrover i Llaneras, C.R. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of Clerics Regular


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1900Born
24 Sep 191616.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
19 Apr 192424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
Jul 1965²65.2ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of Clerics Regular
24 Aug 196565.3DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Congregation of Clerics Regular

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Julian Adrover i Llaneras
Father Julian Adrover i Llaneras C.R. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of Clerics Regular

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFelanitx

  • a priest for 41.3 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast