Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alamanno Cardinal Adimari

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1362²BornModigliano
13 Dec 140038.9AppointedBishop of Firenze, Italy
16 Nov 140139.9AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
3 Nov 140644.8AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
6 Jun 141149.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
6 Jun 141149.4Elevated to Cardinal
17 Sep 142260.7DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alamanno Adimari:
Cardinal Alamanno Adimari (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio

  • a cardinal for 11.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Jun 1411

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013