Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles Januarius Cardinal Acton

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1803Born
18 Feb 183935.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
24 Jan 184238.8Elevated to Cardinal
24 Jan 184238.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
21 Dec 184643.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
22 Dec 184643.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
23 Jun 184744.2DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics

MicroData Summary for Charles Januarius Acton (VIAF: 34448102)
Charles Januarius Cardinal Acton (born , died ) Prefect of Indulgences and Relics

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaples, Italy

  • a cardinal for 8.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast