Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Acuņa Avellaneda

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1505BornAranda de Duero
4 Jun 154843.4AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
5 Jun 155550.4AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
24 Sep 155550.7DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Acuņa Avellaneda:
Bishop Pedro Acuņa Avellaneda (died ) Bishop of Salamanca

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013