Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johannes Abundi

Deceased

Archbishop of Riga, Latvia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1365¹Born
28 Feb 141853.1AppointedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
13 Mar 141853.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chur, Switzerland
11 Jul 141853.5AppointedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
14 May 142459.3DiedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Abundi (VIAF: 18433167)
Archbishop Johannes Abundi (born 1365, died ) Archbishop of Riga

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 219, and Page 421
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,825
  • d: CB, 16 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast