Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich von Absberg

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1409Born
3 Nov 146556.6SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
3 Jan 146656.7ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
25 May 146657.1Ordained BishopBishop of Regensburg, Germany
26 Jul 149283.3DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von Absberg (VIAF: 77378902)
Bishop Heinrich von Absberg (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDornhausen
Ordained BishopFreising, Diocese of Freising

  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 221
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,476
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,466, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast