Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot François-Nicolas Zurtannen, C.R.A. †

Deceased

Abbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1653³Born
1678²24.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 May 169844.3SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
20 May 170147.3ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
13 Mar 170450.2DiedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Nicolas Zurtannen
Abbot François-Nicolas Zurtannen C.R.A. (born , died ) Abbot of Saint-Maurice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFribourg

  • a priest for 26.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books, 2015, 11, 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018