Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincentius Zucconi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Rosanensis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹Born
12 Mar 162350.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Mar 162350.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 162754.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosanensis

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincentius Zucconi:
Bishop Vincentius Zucconi , Titular Bishop of Rosanensis

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 297

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 18 Jan 2014