Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigismond Zongor

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹BornSpaza
1613¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 164959.5AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
27 Sep 165565.7SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
5 Nov 165767.8DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sigismond Zongor:
Bishop Sigismond Zongor (born 1590, died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

  • a priest for 44.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 356, and Page 359
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015