Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedikt de Zolio

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jul 1440AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
13 Feb 1447AppointedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
18 Jul 1453AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
1454¹DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedikt de Zolio:
Bishop Benedikt de Zolio (died 1454) Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 251, and Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015