Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tommaso Maria Cardinal Zigliara, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Frascati

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1833BornBonifacio, France
1852²18.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
17 May 185622.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
12 May 187945.5Elevated to Cardinal
15 May 187945.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
16 Dec 188653.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
28 Oct 188754.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Studies
1 Jun 189157.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
16 Jan 189359.2AppointedBishop of Frascati, Italy
16 Jan 189359.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
10 May 189359.5DiedBishop-Elect of Frascati, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Maria Zigliara:
Cardinal Tommaso Maria Zigliara O.P. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Frascati

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a cardinal for 14.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 45, and Page 52
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 54
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 May 1879

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013