Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Renato Ziggiotti, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Rector General Emeritus of Salesians of Saint John Bosco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1892Born
15 Sep 190916.9ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Dec 192028.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
Aug 1952³59.8AppointedRector General of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
Apr 1965³72.4ResignedRector General of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
19 Apr 198390.5DiedRector General Emeritus of Salesians of Saint John Bosco

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Renato Ziggiotti
Father Renato Ziggiotti S.D.B. (born , died ) Rector General Emeritus of Salesians of Saint John Bosco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampodoro, Italy

  • a priest for 62.3 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast