Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaus Ziegenbock, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Mar 1377AppointedBishop of Lübeck, Germany
19 Mar 1379AppointedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany
11 Feb 1392DiedBishop of Meißen (Meissen), Germany

MicroData Summary for Nikolaus Ziegenbock:
Bishop Nikolaus Ziegenbock O.P. (died ) Bishop of Meißen (Meissen)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 345, and Page 311

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 24 Jan 2016