Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Zhang Boren (Zhang Bairen, Chang Bairen)

Deceased

Bishop of Hanyang [Hanyang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1914Born
19 Dec 194228.9Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 198672.1Ordained BishopBishop of Hanyang [Hanyang], China
12 Oct 200591.7DiedBishop of Hanyang [Hanyang], China

MicroData Summary for Peter Zhang Boren (Zhang Bairen, Chang Bairen)
Bishop Peter Zhang Boren (Zhang Bairen, Chang Bairen) (born , died ) Bishop of Hanyang [Hanyang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZhangjiazhuang village, Xiantao city
Death PlacePeking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Dec 2019
  • b/c2?: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 40, 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 May 2020

Quantcast