Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Zeno

Deceased

Bishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1585³Born
20 Jul 162640.8AppointedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
25 Jul 162640.8Ordained BishopBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy
6 Feb 164155.4DiedBishop of Torcello (Turris), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Zeno
Bishop Marco Zeno (born Sep 1585, died ) Bishop of Torcello (Turris)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Ordained BishopSan Marco, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria Gloriosa dei Frari, Basilica, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 340
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 35
  • ob/d/c2/loc: AT, 14 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 19 Nov 2018

Quantcast