Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionisiy (Dionizy) Zbyruyskyi (Zbirujski)

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
Oct 1585³AppointedBishop
Dec 1586³Ordained BishopBishop
19 Oct 1596ConvertedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
18 Nov 1603DiedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dionisiy (Dionizy) Zbyruyskyi (Zbirujski)
Bishop Dionisiy (Dionizy) Zbyruyskyi (Zbirujski) (died ) Bishop of Chełm

  • a bishop for 16.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 300
  • b: CB, 23 Jun 2015
  • ab/conv/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,399
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast