Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Zamoyski, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv, Ukraine


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1595AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
30 Aug 1595AppointedTitular Bishop of Philippi
4 Feb 1604AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
30 Mar 1614DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Jan Zamoyski
Archbishop Jan Zamoyski O.S.B. (died ) Archbishop of Lviv

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 279, and Page 220
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 2*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast