Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwik Bartlomiej Załuski

Deceased

Bishop of Płock, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1660³Born
21 Jan 169231.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
21 Jan 169231.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lezhë {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
1 Jun 169938.7AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
1721¹60.3DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludwik Bartlomiej Załuski
Bishop Ludwik Bartlomiej Załuski (born , died 1721) Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBialaczowicz

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 78, and Page 318
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast