Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gasparo Zacchia

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Aug 1460SelectedBishop of Osimo, Italy
1 Sep 1460ConfirmedBishop of Osimo, Italy
23 Nov 1474DiedBishop of Osimo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gasparo Zacchia
Bishop Gasparo Zacchia (died ) Bishop of Osimo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 100
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1460, Number 44*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 31 Aug 2018

Quantcast