Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hubert Yffz (de Rommersdorf), O. Praem. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateEventTitle
11 May 1450AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
11 May 1450AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
14 May 1450Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
5 Feb 1483DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hubert Yffz (de Rommersdorf)
Bishop Hubert Yffz (de Rommersdorf) O. Praem. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKöln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 32.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 101
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,590
  • ob: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1450, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast