Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Leonhard Wismair (Wyssmayer)

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Chur, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Mar 1453SelectedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
12 Nov 1456ConfirmedBishop of Chur, Switzerland
20 May 1458DiedBishop-Elect of Chur, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Leonhard Wismair (Wyssmayer) (VIAF: 80947972)
Father Leonhard Wismair (Wyssmayer) (died ) Bishop-Elect of Chur

EventPlace
Death PlaceChur, Diocese of Chur

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 141
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,456, Number 30*
  • d: CB, 16 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast