Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Wulfstan , O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1008¹BornLong Itchington, Warwickshire
1038²30.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Aug 106254.6AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
8 Sep 106254.6Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
18 Jan 109587.0DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
14 May 1203Canonized

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Wulfstan
Bishop St. Wulfstan O.S.B. (born 1008, died ) Bishop of Worcester

  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 37
  • bp/bd/osb/cano: CB, 14 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Mar 2016