Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Konrad Cardinal de Wittelsbach

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1125¹Born
May 1161³36.3AppointedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
1163²38.0Elevated to Cardinal
1163²38.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
25 Dec 116540.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
1 Aug 117752.5ResignedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
Nov 1183³58.8AppointedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
27 Oct 120075.8DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Konrad de Wittelsbach
Konrad Cardinal de Wittelsbach (born 1125, died ) Archbishop of Mainz

  • a bishop for 34.8 years
  • a cardinal for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,053
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1163
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 321
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,750
  • ob/c2: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Feb 2016