Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Robert J. Winkley, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Kafiristan e Kashmir, Pakistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1860Born
1884¹23.8EnteredMember of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
21 Sep 188929.5Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
24 Oct 191656.6AppointedPrefect of Kafiristan e Kashmir, Pakistan
1 Nov 193070.7DiedPrefect of Kafiristan e Kashmir, Pakistan

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert J. Winkley
Father Robert J. Winkley M.H.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Kafiristan e Kashmir

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChipping, Preston, Diocese of Salford, England, Great Britain
Death PlaceRawalpindi

  • a priest for 41.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b.loc: CL, 23 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 26 Sep 2018

Quantcast