Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Wepelitz

Deceased

Bishop of Havelberg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Aug 1385SelectedBishop of Havelberg, Germany
16 Jan 1386ConfirmedBishop of Havelberg, Germany
22 Feb 1401DiedBishop of Havelberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Wepelitz
Bishop Johann Wepelitz (died ) Bishop of Havelberg

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 272

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast