Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Welmecher, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Titular Bishop of Adramyttium


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jun 1481AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
18 Jun 1481AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
2 Jul 1481Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
30 Jul 1505DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Welmecher
Bishop Johann Welmecher O.F.M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFitzlar
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 24.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 80
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,931
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1481, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast