Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Walsh

Deceased

Bishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1815Born
6 Feb 184731.6AppointedBishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
2 May 184731.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
19 Jan 184933.5DiedBishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland

MicroData Summary for David Walsh
Bishop David Walsh (born , died ) Bishop of Cloyne and Ross

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFermoy

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 212
  • b/c2: CB, 29 May 2013
  • c34: CB, 31 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,726
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast