Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Wale

Deceased

Bishop of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Nov 1360AppointedBishop of Limerick, Ireland
19 Feb 1369AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
10 Nov 1379DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Stephen Wale
Bishop Stephen Wale (died ) Bishop of Meath

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 305, and Page 338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 May 2019

Quantcast