Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Walden

Deceased

Bishop of London, England


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Feb 1398Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
10 Dec 1404AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
6 Jan 1406DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Roger Walden:
Bishop Roger Walden (died ) Bishop of London

  • a bishop for 7.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 311
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013