Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Franz Emmerich Kaspar von Waldbott von Bassenheim

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Worms, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1626¹Born
10 Nov 167953.8SelectedBishop of Worms, Germany
23 Jun 168155.4ConfirmedBishop of Worms, Germany
11 Jul 168357.5DiedBishop-Elect of Worms, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Emmerich Kaspar von Waldbott von Bassenheim
Father Franz Emmerich Kaspar von Waldbott von Bassenheim (born 1626, died ) Bishop-Elect of Worms

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBassenheim

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 420
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast