Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Wacław Wilhelm (Václaw Vilem) Wacławiczek (Václavicek)

Deceased

Former Archbishop-Elect of Lviv, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1788Born
28 Sep 180920.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Nov 180920.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 184758.9AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
29 May 184859.4ResignedArchbishop-Elect of Lviv, Ukraine
18 Sep 186273.7DiedFormer Archbishop-Elect of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Wacław Wilhelm (Václaw Vilem) Wacławiczek (Václavicek)
Father Wacław Wilhelm (Václaw Vilem) Wacławiczek (Václavicek) (born , died ) Former Archbishop-Elect of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChoustnik, Diocese of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic

  • a priest for 52.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 339
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 22
  • bd: CB, 10 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 14 May 2018

Quantcast