Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Konrad von Soest

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1371Born
19 Apr 142857.2SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
16 Jun 142857.4AppointedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
10 May 143766.3DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Konrad von Soest:
Bishop Konrad von Soest (born 1371, died ) Bishop of Regensburg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 414

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 18 Jan 2016