Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fridericus von Pfutschner

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

Titular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1705Born
8 Apr 173024.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Jul 173025.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 175550.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
15 Dec 175550.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
25 Feb 175650.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
6 Jun 176963.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Fridericus von Pfutschner
Bishop Fridericus von Pfutschner (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLaugsbourg

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 200, and Page 453
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast