Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Léo Völker, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1906BornVeghel, Netherlands
29 Jun 193225.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
Jul 1957³50.6AppointedSuperior General of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
1967¹60.1ResignedSuperior General of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
1 Apr 197063.4DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Léo Völker:
Father Léo Völker M. Afr. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)

  • a priest for 37.8 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Jul 2014