Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Burchard von Nabburg

Deceased

Bishop of Halberstadt, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1000Born
18 Oct 103636.0AppointedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
26 Dec 103636.1Ordained BishopBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
18 Oct 105959.0DiedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Burchard von Nabburg (VIAF: 57473808)
Bishop Burchard von Nabburg (born , died ) Bishop of Halberstadt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNabburg

  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast