Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Vich Manrique de Lara

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1530²Born
31 Jul 157343.5AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
10 May 160474.3AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
4 Mar 161282.1DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Vich Manrique de Lara (VIAF: 90685856)
Archbishop Juan Vich Manrique de Lara (born 1530, died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonasterio de la Murta, Archdiocese of Valencia

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 84, Number 509
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 233
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 328
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573, Number 37*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast