Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johannes Franciscus Maria Schutijser, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Minister General Emeritus of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin

Titular See: (Clementinus of Vlissingen)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1909BornVlissingen, Netherlands
8 Sep 193223.5Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Sep 193526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 May 196455.2ElectedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Jun 197061.3CeasedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Jun 198879.3DiedMinister General Emeritus of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin

MicroData Summary for Johannes Franciscus Maria Schutijser:
Father Johannes Franciscus Maria Schutijser O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Minister General Emeritus of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin

  • a priest for 52.7 years

Source(s):
  • mige: AJ, 17 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015